+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 15) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-28-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Taniguchi.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor