+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3281) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor