+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor