+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-13-19 3:21PM in conference room 414.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on TEC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 3:10PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, WAM/JDC.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.