+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 477) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor