+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:05AM in conference room 325.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-16-15.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 443).
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1494), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 69) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.