+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor