+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 10, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDC.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.