+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 388) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 403) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor