+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 350) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH, WAM.
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HTH.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 131) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HTH.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
- The committee(s) on HTH will hold a public decision making on 02-06-13 2:02PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor