+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
- Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1062) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 03-15-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 386) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/THA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/THA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.