+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA/TRE, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/TRA, WAM.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.