+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, Riviere, Slom, Wakai . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani, Ruderman). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 522) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-19-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:05PM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor