+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-06-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-15 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor