+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1494), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 353) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.