+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:40PM in conference room 224.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.