+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 455) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1127) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC/PSM, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor