+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Tupola.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LAB, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 362).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 234) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 1:00PM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.