+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 1:30PM; CR 329.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491).
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-09-21.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1656) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Har; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 411) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, JDC.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.