+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1496) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 449) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-20-19 10:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-12-19 3:20PM in conference room 225.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 3:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor