+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:45PM in conference room 016.
- The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/TEC/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/TEC/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.