+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-19-15 10:05AM in House conference room 309.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:05AM in conference room 016.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.