+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Keith-Agaran.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-09-17 2:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 2:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor