+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA, CPH/WAM.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/WLA, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/WAM.
- Reported from HTH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/WAM.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HTH/AGL, CPN/WAM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/AGL, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.