+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 480) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSI, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor