+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang, Espero, Harimoto, Kim, Ruderman. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 834) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Taniguchi; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor