+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 2:46PM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 225.
- Referred to WTL/AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor