+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 10, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 404) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from GVO/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 3:01PM; CR 016 & Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/TRS, WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor