+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Green.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 1:35PM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HWN, JDC.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 1:30PM in conference room 016.
- Re-Referred to HWN, JDL.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.