+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WLA/CPH, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
- The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.