+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 5:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Taniguchi.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Nakashima, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Hashem, Johanson.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cabanilla, Cheape, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Johanson, Jordan, Kawakami, Oshiro, Say, Takayama, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0).
- Reported from LAB/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1442) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Tsuji, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Carroll, Har, Ito, C. Lee, McDermott.
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ing, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi, Johanson; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04/01/13.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to LAB/CPC, referral sheet 41
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 372) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor