+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor