+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (57)
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Act 164, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 164, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97).
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Takumi, Lowen, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Takumi, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 580).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1756), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-05-17 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in conference room 329.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-17.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 283) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-09-17 10:00AM in conference room 229.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Riviere.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor