+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1461), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 401) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor