+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRS, JDC.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor