+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED/EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Mizuno excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED/EDB.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
- Re-referred to VMI, HED/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 32
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HED/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 369) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/HRE, WAM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor