+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 097, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Act 097, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1198).
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 964).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-26-19.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-26-19.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 960).
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Discharged.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 784).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2139) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 308.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Taniguchi.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor