+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:10PM in conference room 309.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; English Co-Chair; Harimoto.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 541).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1728), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.