+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-10-15 2:05PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Friday 04-10-15 2:05 pm, Room 325.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15 at 2:05 PM in room 325.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-31-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-06-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.