+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 12:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 12:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
- House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 628).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.