+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 425) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/WAM.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor