+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 421) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor