+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor