+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor