+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor