+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:20PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor