+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi, Slom.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor