+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 21
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 5) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-13-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 80) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor