+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-15 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 2:45PM in conference room CR225.
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor