+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 390) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor